PRADER-WILLI SYNDROME ASSOCIATION UK

Charity Number: 1155846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve the Charitable needs of people with Prader Willi Syndrome and their families and carers by the provision of services, advice and support as the Trustee's shall determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £497,574
Total expenditure: £501,101

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 2014: CIO registration
  • 09 January 2015: Funds received from 284583 PRADER-WILLI SYNDROME ASSOCIATION (UK)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • PWSA UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fiona Swinhoe Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
Rebecca Neish Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
Laura Pearson Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
Dr Evelien Francesca Gevers Trustee 18 November 2023
None on record
Rosa McKay Polaschek Trustee 18 November 2023
None on record
Susan Passmore Trustee 18 November 2023
None on record
Andrew Abbott Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record
Karen Potts Trustee 28 November 2020
None on record
Anne Good Trustee 25 November 2017
None on record
Dr Anne Livesey Trustee 25 November 2017
None on record
Danny Leslie Trustee 25 November 2017
None on record
Dr Robin Chung Trustee 08 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £414.97k £547.57k £361.57k £383.38k £497.57k
Total expenditure £404.53k £328.38k £364.34k £518.90k £501.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £503.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £5.53k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £38.54k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £116 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £37 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £172.07k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £320.87k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £7.51k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.01k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PWSA UK
c/o Metcalf Commercial Decorators
3 Deer Park Road
Moulton Park Industrial Estate
NORTHAMPTON
Phone:
01332365676