CREATE RECOVERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of people who have suffered from addictive disorders but who are in abstinent recovery, together with their families & dependents and to advantage education of the wider community about the issues concerning addiction and those living in abstinent recovery. 'Abstinent Recovery' means non engagement with addictive processes & behaviours supported by a relevant 12-step programme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 October 2014: Standard registration
- FREEDOM FROM ADDICTION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick McDowell | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DIANA CAITILIN LEVETT-PRINSEP FDAP | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HAMILTON BALLANTYNE FDAP | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00k | £11.84k | £21.58k | £910 | £245 | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.00k | £9.02k | £15.69k | £13.67k | £9.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM ADDICTIVE DISORDERS BUT WHO ARE IN ABSTINENT RECOVERY, TOGETHER WITH THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY ABOUT THE ISSUES CONCERNING ADDICTION AND THOSE LIVING IN ABSTINENT RECOVERY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS “ABSTINENT RECOVERY” MEANS NON-ENGAGEMENT WITH ADDICTIVE PROCESSES AND BEHAVIOURS SUPPORTED BY THE USE OF A RELEVANT 12-STEP PROGRAMME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Swindon Road
Horsham
RH12 2HD
- Phone:
- 07919412566
- Email:
- ali@createrecovery.org
- Website:
-
createrecovery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window