THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, PATHFINDER CITY OF PRAISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides religious activities, prevention or relief of poverty,provides advocacy/advice and information and giving grants to individuals,the general public, mankind and organisations that duly needed such grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warrington
Governance
- 20 January 2014: Standard registration
- RCCG PATHFINDER CITY OF PRAISE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR SAKIRAT TOYIN BALOGUN | Chair | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLAYIWOLA TIMOTHY OLOIDI | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
AWONIYI OLUWAFEMI AWOYEMI | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.45k | £31.34k | £39.12k | £38.33k | £41.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.12k | £23.79k | £36.98k | £37.55k | £31.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orford Community Hub
Festival Avenue
Warrington
WA2 9EP
- Phone:
- 01925597782
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window