WIVENHOE HOUSING TRUST [WHT]

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of almshouses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 13 May 2014: CIO registration
- 17 February 2017: Funds received from 1090578 WIVENHOE HOUSING TRUST
- WHT (Working name)
- WIVENHOE HOUSING TRUST [CIO] (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hutchings | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Shaun Boughton | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Deborah-Lea Taylor | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Brooks | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Gill Sleightholm | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Colin Andrews | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Colin Kelly | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Martin Hill | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Robert Neve | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||||||
ROBERT NEEDHAM | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.45k | £78.89k | £75.75k | £83.91k | £77.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.34k | £67.29k | £27.92k | £69.55k | £19.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 May 2014 as amended on 18 Oct 2019 as amended on 04 Nov 2019 as amended on 04 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR BENEFICIARIES; (2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; (3) RELIEF IN NEED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING CLAUSE. RELIEF IN NEED (1) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OF BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (2) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE UNDER THIS CLAUSE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS RESIDENT OUTSIDE OF, OR ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN, THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 COLCHESTER ROAD
WIVENHOE
COLCHESTER
CO7 9EU
- Phone:
- 01206823073
- Email:
- peter@toadhall2.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window