SENTIENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education, care and wellbeing of the pupils at the schools, to advance the education of other members of the community, and otherwise to benefit the community? It is intended that the curriculum and ethos of the Schools will place an emphasis on, and include a commitment to students learning about, the Co-operative values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 15 April 2014: Standard registration
- SENTIENT TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Shinn | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Harvey | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEVON COUNTY COUNCIL | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Wilce | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Gareth Jones | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Borroughs | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bevan | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Allman | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Gray | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Mitchell | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ANDREW HARRIS | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEITH RAYMOND BENNETT | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
FAITH EVELYN BUTLER | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.50k | £36.49k | £0 | £10.57k | £10.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.39k | £16.64k | £12.09k | £5.92k | £2.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/07/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, CARE AND WELLBEING OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOLS, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, AND OTHERWISE TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY, IT BEING ACKNOWLEDGED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THE OBJECTS THE TRUST MUST (WHERE APPLICABLE) HAVE REGARD TO ITS OBLIGATION TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS. IT IS INTENDED THAT THE CURRICULUM AND ETHOS OF THE SCHOOLS WILL PLACE AN EMPHASIS ON, AND INCLUDE A COMMITMENT TO STUDENTS LEARNING ABOUT, THE CO-OPERATIVE VALUES OF SELF-HELP, SELF RESPONSIBILITY, DEMOCRACY, EQUALITY, EQUITY, SOLIDARITY, HONESTY, OPENNESS, SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY AND CARING FOR OTHERS WITH THE AIM OF ENCOURAGING ALL STUDENTS TO BECOME BETTER CITIZENS, NOT ONLY WHILE THEY ARE STUDENTS BUT DURING THE REST OF THEIR LIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Devon County Council
Marland School
Peters Marland
TORRINGTON
Devon
EX38 8QQ
- Phone:
- 01805 601324
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window