THE TEMPLE OF GOD INTERNATIONAL FELLOWSHIP

Charity Number: 1155734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity holds public celebration of Christian festivals, prayer meetings and teaching sessions on the Christian faith. It produces and distributes literature on Christianity to help others understand the Christian religion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £33,114
Total expenditure: £31,778

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barking And Dagenham
  • Newham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 February 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jose Adrian Capitan Trustee 12 July 2015
None on record
Dyan Jyre Mechure Sorilla Trustee 12 July 2015
None on record
ESTELITA MACANAS RIZARDO Trustee 20 January 2014
None on record
ZORINA BANAAG Trustee 20 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £25.74k £25.86k £25.99k £22.51k £33.11k
Total expenditure £26.13k £13.89k £24.79k £25.15k £31.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 23 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 23 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 16 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 24 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 24 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 09 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 17 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 17 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
48 PALACE ROAD
LONDON
N11 2PR
Phone:
07952030274