MAIDSTONE CHURCHES WINTER SHELTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a Winter Shelter for the homeless in Maidstone. This includes a hot meal and a social evening provided by a host of volunteers; a bed for the night and breakfast in the morning. During their stay, the Guest can obtain advice and help to find permanent housing, making contact with family members and assistance with other inter agency facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
128 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 17 April 2014: CIO registration
- MCWS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GORDON MICHAEL MACKLEY | Chair | 18 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Chris Hutchinson | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Williams | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth McPherson | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zofia Grzymala | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV CANON JOHN TAPPER | Trustee | 17 August 2016 |
|
|||||
WENDY Ellen FOSTER | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.15k | £49.42k | £108.66k | £61.03k | £97.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.08k | £40.76k | £76.54k | £93.93k | £95.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £5.00k | £41.88k | £3.00k | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AMONG PERSONS IN THE BOROUGH OF MAIDSTONE, KENT WHO ARE HOMELESS, SLEEPING ROUGH OR OTHERWISE ROOFLESS BY: (1)PROVIDING HOSPITALITY AND OVERNIGHT SHELTER FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE IN THE WINTER MONTHS. (2)ENGAGING MEMBERS OF CHURCHES IN MAIDSTONE AND OTHER VOLUNTEERS IN BUILDING SUPPORTIVE RELATIONSHIPS WITH HOMELESS PEOPLE IN MAIDSTONE, WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, OR RELIGION. (3)SUPPORTING HOMELESS PEOPLE TO FIND LONG- TERM ACCOMMODATION. (4)UNDERTAKING SUCH OTHER PURPOSES IN RELATION TO THE NEEDS OF HOMELESS PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maidstone Churches Winter Shelter
6 Buckland Road
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME16 0SL
- Phone:
- 01580713836
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window