AMBERSIDE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To secure the future of the Amber film & photography Collection by: maintaining its integrity and addressing conservation needs; supporting Side Gallery & Cinema, where the work can be seen; extending access through touring and online work; building awareness of its story; and enabling the new work (acquisition,production & educational activity) which will take this living archive forward
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 05 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Martyn Hudson | Chair | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Grassick | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simone Jimena Rudolphi | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philippa Jane Oldfield | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Laffler | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phyllida Mary Bridget Shaw | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Rees | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Watson | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mick Henry | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.37k | £43.10k | £44.91k | £24.55k | £31.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.88k | £26.22k | £58.56k | £15.26k | £20.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 March 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 March 2022 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Mar 2015 as amended on 28 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR FILM AND PHOTOGRAPHY, BY: - THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF SIDE GALLERY & CINEMA, NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE AND THE AMBER FILM AND PHOTOGRAPHY COLLECTION (THE COLLECTION); - THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, ACCESSIBILITY AND INTERPRETATION OF THE COLLECTION; - THE COMMISSIONING AND ACQUISITION OF NEW PHOTOGRAPHY, FILM AND AUDIO VISUAL WORK, THE PROGRAMMING OF EXHIBITIONS AND SCREENINGS, AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF EDUCATIONAL WORK. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, THE COLLECTION REFERS TO A BODY OF WORK WHICH HAS EVOLVED THROUGH THE PRODUCTION, EXHIBITION, TOURING AND COLLECTING ACTIVITY OF AMBER ASSOCIATES AND AMBER FILM & PHOTOGRAPHY COLLECTIVE CIC. THE WORK IS FOCUSED ON THE LIVES AND LANDSCAPES OF DIFFERENT COMMUNITIES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, WORKING CLASS, INDUSTRIAL AND POST INDUSTRIAL, RURAL, REFUGEE, MARGINALISED, ITINERANT AND SUCH PEOPLE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING CHANGE OR THREAT TO THEIR CULTURE OR WAY OF LIFE, IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND, NATIONALLY OR INTERNATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AmberSide Trust
5-9 Side
Newcastle-upon-Tyne
NE1 3JE
- Phone:
- 0191 232 2000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window