Trustees MOORDOWN BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1156083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Pearse Trustee 19 September 2022
None on record
Raymond Leonard Heal Trustee 10 August 2020
None on record
James William Hill Trustee 17 December 2019
None on record
Neil Manning Trustee 29 August 2018
None on record
WAYNE EDWARD ROWLEY Trustee 14 February 2014
None on record