HARMONY INSPIRES OXFORD BARBERSHOP CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances the Education of members and the public in the barbershop style of 4-part harmony singing, through 1) weekly rehearsals for members, with coaching 2) Holding educational courses and open days for members of the public 3) Competing in choral competitions 4) Performing for the general public and private groups 5) Putting on shows
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 June 2014: CIO registration
- HARMONY INSPIRES (Working name)
- HARMONY INSPIRES OXFORD LADIES BARBERSHOP CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Constance Louise Wallcraft | Chair | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Emett | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Green | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rosemary Berry | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Chatterton | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Louise Mcleod | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michele Evelyn Steele | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.11k | £8.75k | £9.69k | £13.33k | £15.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.43k | £5.50k | £16.80k | £13.76k | £13.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Jun 2014 as amended on 09 Dec 2021 as amended on 15 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC IN THE BARBERSHOP STYLE OF 4-PART HARMONY SINGING, THROUGH REHEARSALS, EDUCATIONAL COURSES, COMPETITION AND SHOWS 2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES, FROM TIME TO TIME, THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hill View Lane
Wootton
Boars Hill
OXFORD
OX1 5JT
- Phone:
- 07939211862
- Email:
- info@harmonyinspires.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window