Accounts and annual returns EDWARD EDWARDS LIBRARY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1157152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 August 2023 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 September 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required