Financial history HOLMEWOOD ANIMAL RESCUE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1155991
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £10.08k £13.13k £17.22k £15.58k £20.22k
Total expenditure £23.78k £33.93k £29.87k £24.39k £21.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A