UGANDA DIASPORA ENGAGEMENT - UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing services, workshops, and general support to the Ugandan Diaspora and the African Diaspora in the Greater London area. Promoting mental health awareness in the Ugandan Community, in partnership with Ugandan Diaspora Health Foundation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- UDE-UK (Working name)
- UGANDA DIASPORA ENGAGEMENT-UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 22 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 20 February 2017 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE UGANDAN/AFRICAN COMMUNITY DUE TO THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION BY PROVIDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: (I) TRAINING THROUGH WORKSHOPS IN LITERACY AND CV WRITING (II) MENTORING TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND GUIDANCE TOWARDS EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT (III) COUNSELLING, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND GENERAL SUPPORT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window