ACTION AGAINST DISCRIMINATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROMOTED KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND AWARENESS REGARDING DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. THESE ACTIVITIES ENDEAVOURED TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 2014: Standard registration
- 09 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 November 2017: Re-registered
- SUPPORT FOR CHARITY (Working name)
- NTBC LIMITED (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN ALEXANDER METLISS LLB | Chair | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Shulman | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HARRIS SHERWOOD | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANTHONY STEIN | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEE ELLIOT CORY LLB | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £1.60k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £764 | £461 | £629 | £550 | £659 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 4.1.1 PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; 4.1.2 ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; 4.1.3 WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Howard Kennedy Llp
No 1 London Bridge
LONDON
SE1 9BG
- Phone:
- 02037555805
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window