Financial history ST. ANDREW'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1156544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2020 27/02/2021 27/02/2022 27/02/2023 27/02/2024
Total gross income £16.42k £3.03k £8.80k £19.08k £19.14k
Total expenditure £18.52k £6.54k £560 £12.98k £16.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A