BOREHAMWOOD FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to give out food to those in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £55,000 from 5 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 31 January 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Milner | Chair | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ed Badke | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Lean | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Papagapiou | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Collins | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Wilson | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meghna Dalmia | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Nagler | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Walker King | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zain Rizvi | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.24k | £139.79k | £144.64k | £229.61k | £209.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.91k | £59.75k | £118.43k | £192.77k | £200.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £36.62k | £46.65k | £55.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 31 Jan 2014 as amended on 10 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED IN BOREHAMWOOD AND THROUGHOUT THE BOROUGH OF HERTSMERE BY: 1) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD PACKS OF DRIED AND TINNED FOODS SUFFICIENT FOR 3 DAYS TO ENSURE A HEALTHY AND BALANCED DIET AND SERVICES AS MY BE OF HELP. 2) TO PROVIDE OTHER SUCH ITEMS AS MAY BE OF HELP SUCH AS TOILETRIES, CHILDREN'S TOYS, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AS THEY ARE AVAILABLE. 3) TO PROVIDE A LISTENING EAR FOR THOSE WHO WOULD LIKE ONE. 4) TO SIGNPOST CLIENTS TO OTHER AGENCIES THAT MAY BE ABLE TO HELP THEM FURTHER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
291 Shenley Road
Borehamwood
WD6 1TG
- Phone:
- 0203 583 1109
- Website:
-
borehamwood.foodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window