HURST GREEN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds for students at Hurst Green Infant and Nursery school. In the past year we have provided funding towards classroom book corners, purchasing headphones to use with Chromebooks, and a visit from the Life Bus providing PSE. We raise money through school discos, the village fair, Christmas events, mufti days, sponsored events, mother's day and father's day shops, and easter egg hunts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 28 April 2014: Standard registration
- HGSA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Brown | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hall | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Elizabeth Macaulay | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.12k | £1.47k | £3.31k | £3.65k | £3.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.52k | £1.33k | £2.45k | £3.91k | £3.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hurst Green School
Wolfs Wood
OXTED
RH8 0HJ
- Phone:
- 01883712171
- Email:
- hgsa@hurstgreenschool.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window