Financial history CYNLLUN CYFEIRIO GWYNEDD REFERRAL SCHEME

Charity number: 1157600
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £39.59k £39.17k £29.65k £4.28k £3.67k
Total expenditure £40.64k £45.29k £32.03k £4.04k £4.75k
Income from government contracts £37.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £35.17k £16.93k N/A N/A