WATERWAYS EXPERIENCES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of canal trips on boats with full disabled access and of other facilities especially for individuals or groups with, or supporting people with, a disability or in any way disadvantaged. Based on the Grand Union Canal at Nash Mills, Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
148 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Northamptonshire
- Warwickshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 April 2014: CIO registration
- WATERWAYS EXPERIENCES (Working name)
- WEXP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Edward Sykes | Chair | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dickins | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Wilson | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elena Oana Bratulescu | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomson | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.66k | £42.10k | £84.71k | £110.74k | £111.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.15k | £57.82k | £45.16k | £88.72k | £95.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £100 | £10.00k | £17.47k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 08 APR 2014 AMENDED ON 14/11/2015 as amended on 19 Jun 2020 as amended on 03 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A BOAT BASE AND CANAL BOATS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nash Mills Recreation Centre
Red Lion Lane
Hemel Hempstead
HP3 9TE
- Phone:
- 07831415744
- Email:
- trustees@wexp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window