BURY CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to Cancer Patients and their Families. The Centre is the Multi Agency Cancer Service for Bury and local areas A range of Services : Counselling . Hypnotherapy Relaxation Classes . Nutrional Advice ,Financial and Debt advice. Benefits Advice. Health and Employment Support. Massage. Bowen Therapy. Aromatherapy . Mindfulness . Reiki. Qi Gong.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Wigan
Governance
- 25 February 2014: CIO registration
- 15 July 2014: Funds received from 1105130 BURY CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE
- BURY CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JEFF GREEN | Chair | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Barlow | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE MARLAND | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.17k | £235.03k | £206.28k | £126.33k | £168.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.66k | £167.78k | £151.68k | £166.30k | £186.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
THE FOUNDATION ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO ALLEVIATE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS WITH CANCER.OF THEIR PARTNERS AND IMMEDIATE FAMILY OF PERSONS WITH CANCER AND OF PERSONS RECENTLY BEREAVED THROUGH CANCER. THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BURY,ALL AREAS BORDERING ON IT AND SUCH AREAS AS THE ASSOCIATION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
406 Bolton Road
BURY
LANCASHIRE
BL8 2DA
- Phone:
- 01617646609
- Email:
- infoBCSC@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window