Accounts and annual returns ALL WALKS BEYOND THE CATWALK LIMITED

Charity number: 1158747
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 February 2020 233 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 October 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 24 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required