Trustees THE WILDLIFE GARDENING FORUM

Charity number: 1156608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Judith Bostock Chair 12 November 2020
None on record
Hafsah Hafeji Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
Stephanie Karen Bird Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
Clare Wright Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Alison Vitale Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Adrian Hugh Thomas Trustee 09 December 2021
None on record
Dr Mark Adam Goddard Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record
Mary Elizabeth Jackson Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record
Judith Conroy Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record