WESSMAPS HOUSING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide intensive housing management and tenancy related support for vulnerable and disabled people within in Hampshire and the surrounding counties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£783,860
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £780.04k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.82k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£581,210
Raising funds | £36.59k | |
Charitable activities | £544.62k | |
Other | £0 |
-£9,958 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £36.59k | |
Charitable expenditure | £544.62k | |
Retained for future use | £202.65k |
People

19 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
- West Berkshire
- West Sussex
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 13 March 2014: CIO registration
- WESSMAPS HOUSING (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Cavanagh | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MCKEOWN | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||||
TRUDY MCKEOWN | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.37k | £370.57k | £536.73k | £609.32k | £783.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.73k | £311.81k | £459.56k | £521.59k | £581.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £536.20k | £608.58k | £780.04k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £533 | £735 | £3.82k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £416.15k | £486.37k | £544.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £43.41k | £35.22k | £36.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.17k | £6.52k | £1.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £24.80k | £20.43k | £42.02k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £519.41k | £715.99k | £1.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £342.15k | £446.62k | £590.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2023 | 361 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SERVICES TO, IN PARTICULAR BUT EXCLUSIVELY, DISABLED AND VULNERABLE PEOPLE LIVING AND WORKING IN HAMPSHIRE, DORSET, WILTSHIRE, THE ISLE OF WIGHT, BERKSHIRE, WEST SUSSEX, SOUTHAMPTON AND PORTSMOUTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORTED HOUSING THAT ENABLES DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE TO LIVE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; ENABLING THEM TO FINANCIALLY MEET HOUSING COSTS; ENABLING FAIR ACCESS TO PRIVATE RENTAL HOUSING PROVISIONS; PROVIDING ACCESS TO INTEREST FREE LOANS TO FUND HOUSING DEPOSITS AND HOME SET UP COSTS; THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL HOUSING MANAGEMENT SERVICES ALL OF WHICH SUCH PERSONS COULD NOT AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESSMAPS HOUSING TRUST
UNIT 406
SOLENT BUSINESS CENTRE
343 MILLBROOK ROAD WEST
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 0HW
- Phone:
- 02381844331
- Email:
- jane.lockey@wessmaps.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window