VULTURE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vulture Club exists to provide contextual support primarily but not exclusively for individuals seeking to make permanent their personal recovery goal of remaining abstinent from the use of addictive substances and to re develop lifestyles away from being dependent on or centred around the use of substances either recreationally or contextually as part of their broader lifestyle choices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £40,609 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 18 July 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Judd | Chair | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Appleby | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Lakes | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Shiels | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Demika Beard | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Alvar Hemming | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE WILLMAN | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.26k | £31.60k | £57.12k | £89.10k | £89.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.07k | £37.23k | £44.33k | £82.90k | £107.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.27k | £6.14k | £40.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 18 Jul 2014 as amended on 24 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF ADULTS SUFFERING WITH SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN CUMBRIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO SUFFERERS OF SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES. 3. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vulture Club Health and Wellbeing Centre
Unit 7-8 Tangier Buildings
Gregg's Lane
WHITEHAVEN
Cumbria
CA28 7UH
- Phone:
- 01946748687
- Email:
- info@vultureclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window