Financial history FRIENDS AT BREAMORE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1155818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/08/2020 04/08/2021 04/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.71k £2.34k £7.27k £4.88k £5.16k
Total expenditure £10.09k £1.37k £774 £11.98k £10.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A