BAIROLIYA FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1155732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

working on providing cheap generic medicines to the poor in India

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £1,876
Total expenditure: £2,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 February 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAJIB BAIROLIYA FCA, MBA Chair 03 February 2014
None on record
SITA BAIROLIYA Trustee 03 February 2014
None on record
SARITA BAIROLIYA Trustee 03 February 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £109 £259 £698 £4.93k £1.88k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £4.10k £105 £2.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 August 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 21 June 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 June 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 June 2022 378 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 June 2022 743 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 CASSIOBURY PARK AVENUE
WATFORD
WD18 7LB
Phone:
01923223999
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available