THE HISTORIC TOWNS TRUST

Charity Number: 1160040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education and knowledge through the support and promotion of research into the history and topography of cities and towns in Great Britain and by the dissemination of the results of such research, in particular by the publication of historic town atlases and other maps and related works.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £98,945
Total expenditure: £165,944

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • HISTORIC TOWNS TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Vanessa Ann Harding Chair 24 June 2015
None on record
Dr Eliza Hartrich Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Professor Shane Ewen Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Edgar Robin Allies Trustee 10 June 2024
THE BRITISH SCHOOL AT ROME
Received: On time
THE ROBERT ADAM ROME SCHOLARSHIP IN ARCHITECTURE
Received: 41 days late
Dr Sarah Watson Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Giulia Robba Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Peter Charles Whale Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
James John Winterbotham Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
Hayley Wright Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
JOHN NICHOLAS MOORE Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record
Dr Keith Peter Parry Trustee 15 November 2017
THE OXFORDSHIRE RECORD SOCIETY
Received: 36 days late
PROFESSOR MS HELEN ELIZABETH FULTON Trustee 03 March 2017
HONOURABLE SOCIETY OF CYMMRODORION
Received: On time
JULIAN MUNBY BA, FSA Trustee 24 June 2015
THE OXFORD PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
ROEY SWEET Trustee 24 June 2015
MARC FITCH FUND
Received: On time
THE BRITISH SCHOOL AT ROME
Received: On time
PROFESSOR CAROLINE MARY BARRON Trustee 24 June 2015
LONDON RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
PROFESSOR MATTHEW PAUL DAVIES MA, DPHIl. Trustee 24 June 2015
None on record
Dr SARAH RUTH REES JONES PHD, FSA Trustee 24 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £30.26k £40.78k £148.47k £58.91k £98.95k
Total expenditure £35.88k £53.19k £92.29k £79.59k £165.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 08 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 08 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 15 August 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 15 August 2024 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 07 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 02 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH AUGUST 1971 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION OF THE SCIENCE OF HISTORY BY RESEARCH INTO THE TOPOGRAPHY, DEMOGRAPHY AND ECONOMY OF BRITISH TOWNS, BRITISH CITIES AND BRITISH COUNTIES AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 September 1971 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
7 Juniper Drive
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 8RE
Phone:
01628637278