COMMUNITY SUPPORT LAUNDRY OF LIPHOOK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve financial hardship amongst people living in Liphook and its environs by providing such people with laundry and washing facilities which they could not otherwise afford through lack of means
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £779 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 December 2014: Standard registration
- LIPHOOK SUPPORT LAUNDRY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IRENE ELLIS | Chair | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA FROST | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN BROWN | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BETTY HOLT | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.87k | £6.89k | £11.25k | £16.02k | £14.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.79k | £9.23k | £9.23k | £11.18k | £12.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £779 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN LIPHOOK AND ITS ENVIRONS BY PROVIDING SUCH PEOPLE WITH LAUNDRY AND WASHING FACILITIES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Tunbridge Crescent
LIPHOOK
Hampshire
GU30 7QH
- Phone:
- 07990502560
- Email:
- JANE@JORDAN100.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window