Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE FOUNDATION INDIA

Charity number: 1156154
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 February 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 February 2020 3 days late