ELEMENT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Element Society's objective is the advancement in life of young people by providing support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £23,933 from 2 government contract(s) and £79,212 from 8 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- City Of Wakefield
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Leeds City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 22 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Headford | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Gabriella Lesca | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Isman-Egal | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Rattenbury | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN ALEXANDER BALSHAW | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £535.05k | £277.11k | £435.96k | £397.05k | £197.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £458.64k | £244.38k | £343.99k | £391.86k | £288.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.08k | £23.93k | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.46k | £20.71k | £19.60k | £11.99k | £79.21k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £66.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £16.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £452.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £94 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £458.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 December 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 December 2023 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/07/2014 as amended on 21 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Element Society
Yorkshire House
66 Leopold Street
Sheffield
S1 2GZ
- Phone:
- 01142999210
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window