Financial history ELY MUSEUM CIO

Charity number: 1156024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.23m £235.56k £155.08k £159.59k £163.42k
Total expenditure £164.88k £206.65k £321.92k £262.52k £264.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £264.40k £105.68k £80.29k £42.15k £39.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.20m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £5.38k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £20.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £3.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £155.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.61k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A