ELY MUSEUM CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a museum in or near the City of Ely for the public exhibition of articles illustrative of the history of Ely and the fenland, and specimens of the fine and useful arts, ethnology, archaeology, geology, botany and natural history. The extension and preservation of the collection. The provision of lectures and other facilities of education. The promotion of research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,547 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Victoria Greaves | Chair | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caoimhe Ni Dhonaill | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Christine Burke | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellanor Jane Ponton-Hewitt | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lee Gilpin-Davies | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John David Bull | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pip Gardner | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jayne Teresa JAMESON | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Emma CHILDS | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann BIRCH | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.23m | £235.56k | £155.08k | £159.59k | £163.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.88k | £206.65k | £321.92k | £262.52k | £264.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £264.40k | £105.68k | £80.29k | £42.15k | £39.55k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.20m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £20.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £155.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
? THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF ELY FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF ARTICLES ILLUSTRATIVE OF THE HISTORY OF ELY AND THE SURROUNDING FENLAND AREA, AND SPECIMENS OF THE FINE AND USEFUL ARTS, ARCHAEOLOGY, GEOLOGY AND NATURAL HISTORY; ? THE EXTENSION, ENHANCEMENT, CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND STORAGE OF THE COLLECTIONS OF THE MUSEUM; ? THE PROVISION OF LECTURES AND OTHER FACILITIES OF EDUCATION: AND ? THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH RELATING TO THE COLLECTION OF THE MUSEUM AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS THEREOF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ely Museum
The Old Gaol
Market Street
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB7 4LS
- Phone:
- 01353666655
- Email:
- curator@elymuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window