THE HANDS UP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of Action Syria, the operating name of the charity, are to make sure Syrian communities have the medical care and education they need, every day and when emergencies strike. The charity focuses on the relief and assistance of victims of war, conflict or natural disaster, through humanitarian assistance, particularly for people in Syria and surrounding countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£504,109
Donations and legacies | £417.44k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £86.02k | |
Investments | £644 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£659,041
Raising funds | £79.49k | |
Charitable activities | £579.55k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £79.49k | |
Charitable expenditure | £579.55k |
People

6 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Iraq
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Syria
- Turkey
Governance
- 01 April 2014: CIO registration
- ACTION SYRIA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Lopoukhine | Chair | 14 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Francis James Edward Lyon | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAZEN GHARIBAH | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Alexander Wallace Coleman | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Roberts | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Haslam | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISA Katherine Delia Leeper | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE BUTLER | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £526.29k | £682.18k | £584.04k | £721.57k | £504.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £539.60k | £625.88k | £515.45k | £740.89k | £659.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £396.60k | £646.29k | £496.21k | £681.82k | £417.44k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £129.26k | £35.43k | £87.76k | £39.68k | £86.02k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £435 | £458 | £78 | £68 | £644 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £386.69k | £522.65k | £369.81k | £616.88k | £579.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £152.91k | £103.23k | £145.64k | £124.01k | £79.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.16k | £12.68k | £3.50k | £3.78k | £4.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £313.46k | £447.24k | £270.15k | £452.10k | £431.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £856 | £436 | £394 | £205 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £445.63k | £482.57k | £559.66k | £539.18k | £314.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £169.86k | £151.37k | £159.44k | £158.23k | £87.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 01 APR 2014 AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2017 as amended on 04 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST THE VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT OR NATURAL DISASTER, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, MEDICAL AID, ACCOMMODATION, ACCESS TO WATER AND SANITATION AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE; THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY PROVIDING PERSONS IN NEED WITH GRANTS OR MONEY OR BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR SERVICES, ITEMS OR FACILITIES; SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR FOR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PEOPLE IN SYRIA AND SURROUNDING COUNTRIES AND REFUGEES OF SYRIAN ORIGIN IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Action Syria
Rich Mix Cultural Centre
35-47 Bethnal Green Road
London
E1 6LA
- Phone:
- 07871886316
- Email:
- contact@actionsyria.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window