THE BLACK COUNTRY LIVING MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The open-air Museum, through the use of its Designated collections, provides opportunities for the public, including many thousands of pupils and students, to gain a better understanding, appreciation and knowledge of the history and international significance and impact of the Black Country and its people, over a period of 200 years, to c1960.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£12,855,700
Donations and legacies | £3.11m | |
Charitable activities | £5.88m | |
Other trading activities | £56.69k | |
Investments | £10.29k | |
Other | £3.79m |
Total expenditure:
£11,241,026
Raising funds | £3.45m | |
Charitable activities | £7.79m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.45m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.79m | |
Retained for future use | £1.61m |
People

152 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 October 1975: Standard registration
- 06 May 2005: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- THE BLACK COUNTRY LIVING MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE BLACK COUNTRY MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PAUL BELFORD | Chair | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jones | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tarlok Singh Mander | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bourner | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Murphy | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katy Baker | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jessop | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Marie Levesley | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Follows | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Duncan Peter Bedhall | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Badyal | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00m | £12.00m | £19.73m | £15.75m | £12.86m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.11m | £7.15m | £7.31m | £9.22m | £11.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.14m | £1.64m | £3.75m | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £840.05k | £5.19m | £12.10m | £7.84m | £3.11m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.90m | £802.82k | £2.24m | £2.99m | £56.69k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.94m | £5.95m | £5.34m | £4.85m | £5.88m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.22k | £3.07k | £303 | £2.40k | £10.29k | |
|
Income - Other | £311.19k | £49.34k | £50.94k | £64.71k | £3.79m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £739.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.73m | £5.89m | £5.40m | £6.60m | £7.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.38m | £1.26m | £1.91m | £2.62m | £3.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.43k | £9.85k | £9.86k | £11.07k | £10.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.45m | £11.76m | £21.19m | £33.77m | £35.14m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.60m | £5.58m | £10.19m | £4.89m | £4.08m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.41m | -£2.78m | -£1.53m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.13m | £522.67k | £2.04m | £2.70m | £1.60m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/09/1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/12/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/09/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/05/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR ALL BY INCREASING AND INSPIRING THE PUBLIC’S UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE SIGNIFICANCE AND IMPACT OF THE BLACK COUNTRY SINCE THE 18TH CENTURY ON THE INDUSTRIALISATION OF THE WORLD AS WELL AS INCREASING THE SUM OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE REGION DURING THIS PERIOD OF ITS HISTORY; AND THE PROVISION, SAFEGUARDING AND DEVELOPMENT OF A MUSEUM AND COLLECTIONS IN THE BLACK COUNTRY AS A MEANS OF RECORDING AND EXEMPLIFYING THE CONTRIBUTION OF THE REGION SINCE THE 18TH CENTURY TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE MODERN INDUSTRIALISED WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 10 October 1975 : Standard registration
- 06 May 2005 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACK COUNTRY LIVING MUSEUM
TIPTON ROAD
DUDLEY
DY1 4SQ
- Phone:
- 0121 557 9643
- Email:
- info@bclm.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window