THE DRANSFIELD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dransfield Foundation is a charity which aims to help children and young people under the age of 18 years of age. The charity has identified specific priorities they wish to support, which include children disadvantaged by ill health or terminal illness, hospices and hospitals, educational projects, and research projects into the effectiveness of new medical treatments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK DRANSFIELD | Chair | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
James Shepherd | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHRISTOPHER MALLEY | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JAYNE HOLMES | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.33k | £5.98k | £6.98k | £55.62k | £20.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.89k | £12.12k | £8.00k | £22.65k | £30.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/03/2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH. (2) THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (4) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dransfield House
2 Fox Valley Way
Fox Valley
SHEFFIELD
S36 2AB
- Phone:
- 01226360644
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window