DAVID'S SLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Other social work activities without accommodation not elsewhere classified
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- South Africa
Governance
- 01 August 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EFE EGHOBAMIEN | Chair | 29 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.24k | £8.56k | £5.67k | £10.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.54k | £5.51k | £7.00k | £9.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR THE CHARITY ARE TO MAKE LOW INTEREST LOANS (THE AMOUNT OF WHICH, THE REPAYMENT PERIOD AND OTHER CONDITIONS OR REGULATIONS ARE TO BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEE(S)) FOR A) THE RELIEF OF NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR TRAINING; OR C) ESTABLISHING THEM IN WORK VOCATION OR OTHERWISE IN LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
David & Stone Ltd
China Works
100 Black Prince Road
LONDON
SE1 7SJ
- Phone:
- 02077934037
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window