WARLINGHAM METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church exists to exercise the whole ministry of Christ. Worship, fellowship, pastoral care, mission and service are essential features of that ministry. Our aim at Warlingham Methodist Church is " As committed followers of Jesus we all desire to be used by the Holy Spirit to make the Love and Power of God real to the people of the neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

22 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 March 2014: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Graham Claydon-Knights | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Juman | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Lambert | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David King | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily King | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Wood | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevane Wallbank | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iris Pitman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Baston | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Preston | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Baston | Trustee | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
deidre Fiona Cobley | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN SKINNER | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JILL GRADON | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER GAMMIE | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL KING | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER JUMAN | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|||||
CURTIS JUMAN | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINA DENCH | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WITHAM | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.95k | £129.18k | £132.45k | £132.33k | £117.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.73k | £126.99k | £128.84k | £124.09k | £137.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Methodist Church
Limpsfield Road
WARLINGHAM
CR6 9LE
- Phone:
- 01883625157
- Email:
- warlinghamchurch@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window