Financial history THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF CHASDEI NAOMI

Charity number: 1158016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £6.06k £9.56k £2.04k £2.42k £6.60k
Total expenditure £5.11k £9.21k £1.40k £3.93k £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A