EDSTART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise self-esteem, knowledge and experience through the power of education also to provide sports to excel growth, encourage participation and social interaction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Trafford
- Warrington
Governance
- 08 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark John Gerard Holleran | Chair | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Burns | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Ollerhead | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES LOWE | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.46k | £28.90k | £50.43k | £53.20k | £30.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.12k | £21.80k | £52.63k | £57.86k | £32.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 07/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN SALFORD CITY,MANCHESTER CITY AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL,EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF:·ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS,CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT,MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS;·ADVANCING EDUCATION;·RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT;·PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY,POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 GERALD ROAD
SALFORD
M6 6DW
- Phone:
- 01617364087
- Email:
- foundation@edstart.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window