NORTHFLEET HARBOUR RESTORATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Archaeology, restoration of community harbour, management of community harbour once restored
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 26 September 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ROLAND MASON DR | Chair | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lester Banks | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Martin | Trustee | 22 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bruce | Trustee | 22 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Conrad Broadley | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £284 | £0 | £59 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £185 | £320 | £320 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/09/2014
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF NORTHFLEET HARBOUR AND THE ADJOINING RIVER THAMES, SO THAT IT MAY CONTINUE TO BE ENJOYED BY PRESENT AND FUTURE GENERATIONS. (IN THIS CLAUSE 'SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PARENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE HERITAGE AND THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL MIND SOCIAL SIGNIFICANCE OF NORTHFLEET HARBOUR AND THE ARTEFACTS ASSOCIATED WITH IT. 3 THE PROVISION OF MARINE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OF THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 Dover Road
Northfleet
Gravesend
DA11 9QD
- Phone:
- 07562194757
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window