NMO SPECTRUM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NMO Spectrum UK, provide direct support funding research into the possible cure for NMO and support those affected by this as yet incurable disease through our grant procedure please view www.nmouk.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 August 2014: Standard registration
- NMO - UK RARE ILLNESS RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA MCCANN | Chair | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Cooper | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HUNT | Trustee | 29 October 2016 |
|
|||||
PARVEEN PANESAR | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.72k | £46.55k | £28.95k | £27.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.35k | £46.50k | £28.97k | £35.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/2014 AS AMENDED ON 29/07/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST SCIENTISTS AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS) ON THE SUBJECT OF NEUROMYELITIS OPTICA AND ITS SYMPTOMS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE CAUSES AND POSSIBLE CURE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 2) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF NEUROMYELITIS OPTICA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Foxley Heath
WIDNES
WA8 7EB
- Phone:
- 07807831349
- Email:
- info@nmouk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window