Accounts and annual returns OUR COMMUNITY TIME BANK

Charity number: 1156078
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 October 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 12 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 12 August 2015 On Time