PEMBROKE TOWN WALLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust has completed a major project to develop a long term management plan to help us work with wall owners and the community to continue the restoration of the outer medieval walls of Pembroke and to develop training in heritage building skills for local people leading to employment. We are also working with the community to raise awareness of this work and understanding of their heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,484 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 27 June 2014: CIO registration
- PTWT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN ELIZABETH MORTENSON | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN THOMAS ALBERT JAMES | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM STUART WHITE | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Daphne Margaret Jane Bush | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN BELL | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER MILES THOMAS | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.92k | £13.30k | £18.46k | £134.80k | £15.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.82k | £13.34k | £29.85k | £148.70k | £6.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.88k | £12.66k | £12.44k | £111.55k | £5.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 27 JUN 2014 AMENDED ON 04 SEP 2017 as amended on 21 May 2020
Charitable objects
• To maintain, restore, preserve and advance public education of the curtain walling of Pembroke Town, within the conservation area, in the County of Pembrokeshire, for the benefit of the people of Pembroke and the public at large. • To advance the education of the public by developing techniques for the maintenance and preservation of the curtain walling of Pembroke Town to train local people in the skills required to carry out these technique, using local resources where possible. • Maintain, restore, preserve and advance public education of the industrial heritage of Pembroke Town Walls, within the Conservation Area in the County of Pembrokeshire, for the benefit of the people of Pembroke and the public at large.
Area of benefit
PEMBROKESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Foundry House
Orange Way
Pembroke
SA71 4DR
- Phone:
- 01646680090
- Email:
- pembroketwt@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window