THE ROSES' CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the Trust are primarily to help the younger generation realise their maximum potential in life. Particularly where medical or educational support may be necessary and where help to a family or community would underpin this overriding aim.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL ELLINAS | Chair | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Thea Rose | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS Jaime Sarah Rose Scudamore | Trustee | 29 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAUDIA ALLAN | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC ROSE | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.75k | £0 | £1.00k | £21.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.11k | £1.98k | £3.47k | £614 | £2.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fisher Phillips Llp
170 Finchley Road
LONDON
NW3 6BP
- Phone:
- 02074836100
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window