Friends of Cotswold Citizens Advice

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising Funds to assist the charitable work of the Citizens Advice Bureau in the Cirencester and Cotswold area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 February 2014: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CIRENCESTER CAB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Susan HANCOCK | Chair | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katanyna Maria Pasternak | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Katherine Kerr-Rettie | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Power | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Christopher Hugh Pogson | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.61k | £25.78k | £4.03k | £1.62k | £1.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.41k | £102 | £27.71k | £3.60k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JAN 2014 as amended on 10 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PROVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN CIRENCESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS. AND FURTHER, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY ASSISTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU IN THE CIRENCESTER AND COTSWOLD DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Citizens Advice Cotswold District
2/3 The Mews
Cricklade Street
Cirencester
Gloucestershire
GL7 1HY
- Phone:
- 01285 888130
- Email:
- valerie.hancock10@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window