FANZA (FOUNDATION FOR AUSTRALIA AND NEW ZEALAND ARTS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the public by promoting and celebrating the range and vitality of Australian and New Zealand life, culture and languages through the performing and visual arts in all forms
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income:
£612,955
Donations and legacies | £611.72k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £1.24k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£601,482
Raising funds | £12.02k | |
Charitable activities | £589.38k | |
Other | £86 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £12.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £589.38k | |
Retained for future use | £11.47k |
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 April 2014: Standard registration
- ANZ FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Del Kiwiroa Marshall | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Nelligan | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maryann Wright | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Janet Fenwick | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Payne | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Guerrini Maraldi | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Whalley OAM | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lyndel Harrison | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Elizabeth Wordley | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.18k | £5.86k | £59.81k | £636.16k | £612.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.64k | £1.75k | £24.99k | £645.92k | £601.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £625.99k | £611.72k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.17k | £1.24k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £635.17k | £589.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £12.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £583.60k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.75k | £86 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £41.50k | £52.97k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 OCT 2020 as amended on 08 Oct 2020 as amended on 13 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
(a) To advance the education of the public by promoting and celebrating the range and vitality of Australian and New Zealand life, culture and languages across all art forms including (but not limited to) literature, film, theatre, music, dance, painting and sculpture and photography (b) To promote such life, culture and languages for the benefit of the public by connecting Australian and New Zealand artists, performers and writers with new and established audiences and communities (c) In furtherance of those objects, to partner with and support individuals and organisations in organising, promoting and curating diverse and inspiring events and conversations (d) To maintain and grow a FANZA hub (involving all forms of communication and networking, written, digital, broadcast, film, electronic and social), providing information on the latest news and events featuring Australian and New Zealand arts and culture.
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 Castelnau
LONDON
SW13 9ET
- Phone:
- 07770443789
- Email:
- admin@FANZA.org
- Website:
-
fanza.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window