WINCHESTER & DISTRICT YOUNG CARERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Mission To improve the lives of children and young people with caring responsibilities by providing safe, quality support to individuals and offering an inclusive, wide ranging, and holistic approach which considers the needs of the whole family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £21,281 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 February 2014: CIO registration
- 11 December 2015: Funds received from 1075409 WINCHESTER YOUNG CARERS PROJECT
- WINCHESTER & DISTRICT YOUNG CARERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jan Ellis | Chair | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Reid | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Pearce | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bee | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Webb | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Power | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Michael Billington | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.42k | £145.86k | £118.49k | £227.94k | £119.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.19k | £153.78k | £140.50k | £131.61k | £159.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.42k | £20.50k | £22.08k | £29.01k | £21.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG CARERS CARING FOR A FAMILY MEMBER WHO HAS A LONG-TERM ILLNESS,DISABILITY OR ADDICTION TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUGS AND WHO LIVE IN THE WINCHESTER COUNCIL DISTRICT AREA BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 12
WINNALL VALLEY ROAD
WINCHESTER
SO23 0LD
- Phone:
- 01962808339
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window