ORE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ore Community Centre sits just off the main road in Ore Village. The centre has several rooms for hire both large and small. Over 100 groups currently use the centre providing activities and events covering ages from 0 to over 100.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 08 May 2014: CIO registration
- 20 September 2016: Funds received from 268942 ORE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Harvey | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lambourne | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|||||
LORD BRETT MCLEAN | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|||||
LAWRENCE BALLARD | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Draper | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.26k | £53.71k | £47.27k | £52.17k | £56.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.08k | £62.55k | £36.96k | £44.95k | £51.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 211 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2023 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2023 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 May 2014
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THE LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS, 3.2 TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY OR PERSON) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS. 3.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED 3.4 THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ore Community Association
455 Old London Road
Hastings
TN35 5BH
- Phone:
- 01424432719
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window