Accounts and annual returns IQRA INTERNATIONAL EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156337
Charity reporting is overdue by 1622 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 161 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 161 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 527 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 527 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 892 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 892 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1257 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1257 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1622 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1622 days