AL-EHSAAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Religius Education for women and childern -Feed the poors
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 05 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
USMAN YOUSAF | Chair | 05 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
ATTIA USMAN | Trustee | 05 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
NOOR FATIMA YOUSAF | Trustee | 05 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70k | £2.10k | £650 | £750 | £692 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.61k | £2.10k | £706 | £658 | £692 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE HANFI JURISPRUDENCE (FIQH) WITHIN SUNNI ISLAM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 Stratford Road
Sparkhill
BIRMINGHAM
B11 1AN
- Phone:
- 07584165161
- Email:
- alehsaan192@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window